MPO Technical Advisory Committee
Previous Members
Jacqueline Scanlan | 1/1/2024 - 3/31/2024 | |
Tim Street | 1/1/2023 - 12/31/2023 | |
Scott Robinson, AICP | 1/1/2021 - 12/31/2023 | |
Neil Kopper | 1/1/2020 - 3/3/2021 | |
Dave Williams | 1/1/2020 - 3/3/2021 | |
Chris Myers | 1/1/2020 - 3/3/2021 | |
Kurt Babcock | 1/1/2020 - 3/3/2021 | |
Jeff Underwood | 3/19/2018 - 12/31/2023 | |
S. Bruce Payton | 3/19/2018 - 10/31/2019 | |
Chris Ciolli | 3/19/2018 - 2/23/2021 | |
Mike Wilcox | 3/19/2018 - 12/31/2022 | |
Danny Stalcup | 3/19/2018 - 12/31/2022 | |
Perry Maull | 3/19/2018 - 10/31/2019 | |
Jim Ude | 3/19/2018 - 3/5/2020 | |
Reggie Arkell | 3/19/2018 - 3/5/2020 | |
Antonio Johnson | 3/19/2018 - 10/31/2019 |