Donald Griffin
- Gender
- male
Appointments
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/1/2021 - 3/26/2021 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/1/2020 - 12/31/2020 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/1/2019 - 12/31/2019 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/1/2018 - 12/31/2018 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/1/2017 - 12/31/2017 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 12/20/2016 - 12/31/2016 |
Redevelopment Commission | (President) | 1/2/2016 - 10/31/2016 |